Limit your search

1-6 of 6
  1. S.Amdt.2400 to S.Amdt.2343   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  2. S.Amdt.2399   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
  3. S.Amdt.2248   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.2204   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To support the State Rural Development Partnership.
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2204 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  5. S.Amdt.2200   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.2164   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0