Limit your search

1-10 of 10
  1. S.Amdt.2452   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
  2. S.Amdt.2423   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
  3. S.Amdt.2405   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/13/2012)
  4. S.Amdt.2306   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  5. S.Amdt.2236   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
  6. S.Amdt.2209   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
  7. S.Amdt.2208   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
  8. S.Amdt.2207   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
  9. S.Amdt.2206   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
  10. S.Amdt.2205   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)