Limit your search

1-6 of 6
  1. S.Amdt.2446 to S.Amdt.2172   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  2. S.Amdt.2348   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  3. S.Amdt.2347   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  4. S.Amdt.2243   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To ensure that performance bonus payments are used by State agencies only to carry out the supplemental nutrition assistance programs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2243 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  5. S.Amdt.2242   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To amend section 520 of the Housing Act of 1949 to revise the census data and population requirements for areas to be considered as rural areas for purposes of such Act.
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 4
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2242 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  6. S.Amdt.2241   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1