Limit your search

1-12 of 12
  • S.Amdt.2433   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To reform the sugar program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2433 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 53. Record Vote Number: 151.
  • S.Amdt.2424   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2379   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2378   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2377   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2376   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2247   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To reduce unnecessary paperwork burdens on community water systems.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Cosponsors: 5
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2247, under the order of 6/18/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 58 - 41. Record Vote Number: 160.
  • S.Amdt.2226   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To eliminate biorefinery, renewable chemical, and biobased product manufacturing assistance.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2226 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 36 - 63. Record Vote Number: 150.
  • S.Amdt.2218   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2217   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To eliminate the organic certification cost share assistance program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2217 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 42 - 57. Record Vote Number: 134.
  • S.Amdt.2216   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2215   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0