Limit your search

1-10 of 10
  1. S.Amdt.2442   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To establish a pilot loan program to support healthy foods for the hungry.
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2442 agreed to in Senate by Division Vote.
  2. S.Amdt.2408   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/13/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  3. S.Amdt.2388   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To modify a provision relating to purchases of locally produced foods.
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/12/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2388 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  4. S.Amdt.2298   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  5. S.Amdt.2297   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.2296   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  7. S.Amdt.2235   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  8. S.Amdt.2221   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  9. S.Amdt.2220   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
  10. S.Amdt.2184   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1