Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/24/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/25/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/13/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 11/27/2012