Text: S.3245 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-176 (09/28/2012)

 
[112th Congress Public Law 176]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 126 STAT. 1325]]

Public Law 112-176
112th Congress

                                 An Act


 
   To extend by 3 years the authorization of the EB-5 Regional Center 
    Program, the E-Verify Program, the Special Immigrant Nonminister 
   Religious Worker Program, and the Conrad State 30 J-1 Visa Waiver 
             Program. <<NOTE: Sept. 28, 2012 -  [S. 3245]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. REAUTHORIZATION OF EB-5 REGIONAL CENTER PROGRAM.

    Section 610 of the Departments of Commerce, Justice, and State, the 
Judiciary, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 1993 (8 U.S.C. 1153 
note) is amended--
            (1) by striking ``pilot'' each place such term appears; and
            (2) in subsection (b), by striking ``September 30, 2012'' 
        and inserting ``September 30, 2015''.
SEC. 2. REAUTHORIZATION OF E-VERIFY.

    Section 401(b) of the Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant 
Responsibility Act of 1996 (8 U.S.C. 1324a note) is amended by striking 
``September 30, 2012'' and inserting ``September 30, 2015''.
SEC. 3. REAUTHORIZATION OF SPECIAL IMMIGRANT NONMINISTER RELIGIOUS 
                    WORKER PROGRAM.

    Section 101(a)(27)(C)(ii) of the Immigration and Nationality Act (8 
U.S.C. 1101(a)(27)(C)(ii)) is amended--
            (1) in subclause (II), by striking ``September 30, 2012'' 
        and inserting ``September 30, 2015''; and
            (2) in subclause (III), by striking ``September 30, 2012'' 
        and inserting ``September 30, 2015''.
SEC. 4. REAUTHORIZATION OF CONRAD STATE 30 J-1 VISA WAIVER 
                    PROGRAM.

    Section 220(c) of the Immigration and Nationality Technical 
Corrections Act of 1994 (8 U.S.C. 1182 note) is amended by striking 
``September 30, 2012'' and inserting ``September 30, 2015''.

[[Page 126 STAT. 1326]]

SEC. 5. <<NOTE: 8 USC 1101 note.>> NO AUTHORITY FOR NATIONAL 
                    IDENTIFICATION CARD.

    Nothing in this Act may be construed to authorize the planning, 
testing, piloting, or development of a national identification card.

    Approved September 28, 2012.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 3245:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 158 (2012):
            Aug. 2, considered and passed Senate.
            Sept. 11, 13, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>