Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/07/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/07/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/14/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/14/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/23/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/23/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/13/2012