Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 02/10/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/08/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/10/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/15/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/30/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/13/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/03/2011