Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/12/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/12/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/12/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/12/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/12/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/18/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/18/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/18/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/18/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/18/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/18/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/18/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/18/2012
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/13/2012