Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 06/04/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 06/04/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/05/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/05/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/06/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/06/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/06/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/18/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/19/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/20/2012