Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 06/05/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/14/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/18/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/25/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/16/2012