Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/11/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/25/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/26/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/26/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/27/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 12/03/2012