Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/14/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/15/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/16/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/02/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/02/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/02/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/14/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/16/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/17/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/14/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/14/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/02/2011