Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 06/07/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/19/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/26/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/10/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/19/2012
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 12/19/2012