Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/13/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/20/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/21/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/19/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/20/2012