Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/19/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/25/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/26/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/28/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/10/2012