Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/20/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 06/20/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/20/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 06/20/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/20/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/20/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/20/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/20/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/20/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 06/20/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/25/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/10/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/17/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 08/02/2012