Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/21/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/21/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 06/21/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 06/21/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/21/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 06/21/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/21/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/25/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/25/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/25/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/10/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/12/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/26/2012