Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
01/14/2013 Became Public Law No: 112-276.
01/14/2013 Signed by President.
01/03/2013 Presented to President.
01/01/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 12/30/2012 H7457)
12/05/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/13/2012 Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry without amendment. With written report No. 112-234.
06/21/2012 Introduced in Senate