Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/26/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/26/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/27/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/18/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/18/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/19/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/30/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/11/2012