There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

DISCLOSE Act of 2012
Democracy Is Strengthened by Casting Light On Spending in Elections Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to provide for additional disclosure requirements for corporations, labor organizations, Super PACs and other entities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/10/2012Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date All Actions
07/24/2012Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights and Human Rights. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights and Human Rights
07/17/2012Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S5072)
Action By: Senate
07/17/2012Upon reconsideration, cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 45. Record Vote Number: 180.
Action By: Senate
07/17/2012Motion by Senator Reid to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to the measure (Roll Call Vote No. 179) agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5071-5072; text: CR S5071)
Action By: Senate
07/17/2012Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to the measure (Roll Call Vote No. 179) agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Senate
07/17/2012Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5051-5052, S5057-5064, S5065-5066, S5066-5071, S5071-5072)
Action By: Senate
07/16/2012Motion by Senator Reid to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to the measure (Roll Call Vote No. 179) entered in Senate. (consideration: CR S5008; text: CR S5008)
Action By: Senate
07/16/2012Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 44. Record Vote Number: 179.
Action By: Senate
07/16/2012Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S4985, S4985-4988, S4988-4991, S4993-4994, S4995-4998, S4999-5003, S5007-5008, S5010-5023, S5025-5044)
Action By: Senate
07/12/2012Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S4942-4943; text: CR S4942)
Action By: Senate
07/12/2012Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S4938-4943)
Action By: Senate
07/12/2012Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S4919-4932)
Action By: Senate
07/11/2012Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 446.
Action By: Senate
07/10/2012Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 07/10/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 07/10/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/10/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 07/10/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 07/10/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 07/10/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 07/10/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 07/10/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/11/2012
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/11/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/11/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/11/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/11/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 07/11/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/11/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/11/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/11/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/11/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/11/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/11/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/11/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/11/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/11/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/11/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/11/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/11/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/11/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/16/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/16/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/16/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/16/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/16/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/16/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/16/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/16/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/16/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/16/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 07/16/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/16/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/17/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights and Human Rights07/24/2012 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3369. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/10/2012)

Democracy Is Strengthened by Casting Light On Spending in Elections Act of 2012 or DISCLOSE Act of 2012 - Amends the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 (FECA) to redefine the term "independent expenditure" as an expenditure by a person that, when taken as a whole, expressly advocates the election or defeat of a clearly identified candidate, or is the functional equivalent of express advocacy because it can be interpreted by a reasonable person only as advocating the election or defeat of a candidate, taking into account whether the communication involved mentions a candidacy, a political party, or a challenger to a candidate, or takes a position on a candidate's character, qualifications, or fitness for office.

Expands the period during which certain communications are treated as electioneering communications.

Prescribes disclosure requirements for corporations, labor organizations, and certain other entities, including a political committee with an account established for the purpose of accepting donations or contributions that do not comply with the contribution limits or source prohibitions under FECA (but only with respect to such accounts).

Repeals the prohibition against political contributions by individuals age 17 or younger.