Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 07/11/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/12/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/16/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/16/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/16/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/17/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/23/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/23/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/23/2012
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/23/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/23/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/23/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/23/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/23/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/23/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/23/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/23/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/23/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/23/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/23/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/23/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/23/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/23/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/23/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/23/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/23/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/23/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/23/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/23/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/23/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/23/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/23/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/23/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/23/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/23/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/23/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/23/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/23/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/23/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/23/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/23/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/23/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/23/2012
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/23/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/23/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/23/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/23/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/23/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/23/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/23/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/23/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/23/2012