Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 07/17/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 07/17/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 07/17/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 07/17/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/17/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 07/17/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 07/17/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/18/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/18/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/18/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/19/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/23/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/23/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/23/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/23/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/25/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/30/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 08/02/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/10/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/19/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/19/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/19/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/19/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/19/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/19/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/20/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/20/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/20/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/21/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/21/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/21/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/13/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 11/13/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/13/2012
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/13/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/13/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/28/2012