Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/18/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/18/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/18/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 07/18/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 07/18/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/18/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 07/18/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 07/18/2012
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 07/18/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 07/18/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 07/19/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/24/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/24/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/25/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/25/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 08/02/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/12/2012