Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/25/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/30/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/31/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/19/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/20/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/20/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 11/27/2012