Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/30/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 08/02/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 08/02/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/10/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/10/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/10/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/10/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/11/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/13/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/13/2012