Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 07/31/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/31/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 07/31/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 07/31/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 07/31/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/19/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/19/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/21/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/28/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 12/17/2012