Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 07/31/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 07/31/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/31/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 07/31/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 07/31/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 07/31/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 07/31/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 08/02/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/02/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/10/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/10/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/13/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/13/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/19/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/19/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/19/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/20/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/20/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/20/2012