There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Uninterrupted Scholars Act (USA)

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Uninterrupted Scholars Act (USA)

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Uninterrupted Scholars Act (USA)

Short Titles as Introduced

Uninterrupted Scholars Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act of 1974 to provide improvements to such Act.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/14/2013Became Public Law No: 112-278. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2013Signed by President.
01/03/2013Presented to President.
01/01/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 12/30/2012 H7450)
12/17/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2012Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2012Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/14/2013Became Public Law No: 112-278. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2013Signed by President.
01/03/2013SenatePresented to President.
01/01/2013-11:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/01/2013-11:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 12/30/2012 H7450)
01/01/2013-11:13pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7559)
12/30/2012-5:55pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Roe (TN) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
12/30/2012-5:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3472.
12/30/2012-5:28pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7450-7453)
12/30/2012-5:28pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/17/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
12/17/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2012-7:31pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/17/2012SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2012SenateS.Amdt.3345 Amendment SA 3345 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2012SenateS.Amdt.3345 Amendment SA 3345 proposed by Senator Hagan for Senator Landrieu. (consideration: CR S8091-8092; text: CR S8091-8092) In the nature of a substitute.
12/17/2012SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8091-8092)
12/17/2012SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2012SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
08/01/2012SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5880)

Cosponsors (9)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 08/01/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 08/01/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 08/01/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 08/01/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 08/01/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 08/01/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/10/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/10/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/05/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions08/01/2012 Referred to
12/17/2012 Discharged from
House Education and the Workforce12/17/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.3472. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-278 (01/14/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on December 17, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Uninterrupted Scholars Act (USA) - Amends provisions of the Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act of 1974 that prohibit the Department of Education from funding educational agencies or institutions that release student educational records (or personally identifiable information other than certain directory information) to any individual, agency, or organization without written parental consent.

Expands the list of organizations exempt from such prohibitions (thereby permitting the educational agencies or institutions participating in a Department of Education program to release records or identifiable information to such organizations without parental consent) to include an agency caseworker or other representative of a state or local child welfare agency or tribal organization authorized to access a student's case plan when such agencies or organizations are legally responsible for the care and protection of the student.

Sets forth conditions including that: (1) the education records, or the personally identifiable information contained in such records, will not be disclosed by such agency or organization, except to an individual or entity engaged in addressing the student's education needs and authorized by such agency or organization to receive such disclosure; and (2) such disclosures be consistent with applicable student record confidentiality laws of states and tribes.

Permits the release of such records and information without additional notice to parents and students when a parent is a party to a court proceeding involving child abuse and neglect or dependency matters and a court order has already been issued in the context of that proceeding.