Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 08/01/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 08/01/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 08/01/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 08/01/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 08/01/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 08/01/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/13/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/13/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/13/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/20/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/13/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/27/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/04/2012