Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 09/10/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/10/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 09/10/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 09/10/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/10/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 09/10/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 09/10/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 09/10/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 09/10/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 09/10/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 09/10/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 09/10/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/12/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/12/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 09/12/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/12/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/13/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/19/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/19/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/20/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/21/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/26/2012