Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 09/13/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/19/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 09/19/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/19/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/19/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/19/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 09/20/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/21/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 11/27/2012