Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 09/19/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 09/19/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 09/19/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/19/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/20/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/21/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/13/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/14/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 11/26/2012