Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/16/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/16/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/16/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/16/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/16/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/16/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/28/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/28/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/01/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/07/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/14/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/15/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/10/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/06/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/08/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/14/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/15/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/15/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/15/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/15/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/15/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/16/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/20/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/20/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/21/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/23/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/28/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/07/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/27/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/29/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/06/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/06/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/06/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/04/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/13/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 11/08/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/09/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/09/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/15/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 12/05/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 12/12/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 01/30/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/22/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/28/2012
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/16/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/08/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/17/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/24/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/26/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/26/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/27/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/29/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/29/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/10/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/11/2012
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/17/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/31/2012