Committees: S.363 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation02/16/2011 Referred to
05/05/2011 Markup by
11/08/2011 Reported by S. Rept. 112-133
House Natural Resources11/14/2011 Referred to
04/25/2012 Markup by
05/30/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-502
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs11/29/2011 Referred to
12/15/2011 Hearings by
04/25/2012 Discharged from