There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to temporarily extend the transaction account guarantee program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/26/2012Introduced in Senate

All Actions (33)

Date All Actions
12/13/2012S.Amdt.3315 SA 3315 fell when SA 3314 fell.
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012S.Amdt.3314 SA 3314 fell when the bill was committed.
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012S.Amdt.3318 SA 3318 fell when SA 3317 fell.
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012S.Amdt.3317 SA 3317 fell when SA 3316 fell.
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012S.Amdt.3316 SA 3316 fell when the bill was committed.
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012Motion by Senator Reid to commit to Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs with instructions to report back forthwith with amendment SA 3316 fell when the bill was committed in Senate. (consideration: CR S8001)
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012Committed to Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs pursuant to Sec. 312(f) of the Congressional Budget Act.
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012Cloture motion on the bill withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (consideration: CR S8004)
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012The point of order was sustained.
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012Motion to waive all applicable budgetary discipline with respect to the measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 42. Record Vote Number: 227. (consideration: CR S8004)
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012Motion to waive all applicable budgetary discipline with respect to the measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S8003)
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012Point of order that the measure violates section 302(f) of the CBA raised in Senate.
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S8001-8004)
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012S.Amdt.3314 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S8001)
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012S.Amdt.3315 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S8001)
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012S.Amdt.3316 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S8001)
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012S.Amdt.3317 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S8001)
Action By: Senate
12/13/2012S.Amdt.3318 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S8001)
Action By: Senate
12/11/2012Cloture motion on the bill presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S7724; text: CR S7724)
Action By: Senate
12/11/2012S.Amdt.3318 Amendment SA 3318 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 3317. (consideration: CR S7724; text: CR S7724) Of a perfecting nature.
Action By: Senate
12/11/2012S.Amdt.3317 Amendment SA 3317 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 3316. (consideration: CR S7724; text: CR S7724) Of a perfecting nature.
Action By: Senate
12/11/2012S.Amdt.3316 Amendment SA 3316 proposed by Senator Reid. (consideration: CR S7724; text: CR S7724) To change the enactment date.
Action By: Senate
12/11/2012Motion by Senator Reid to commit to Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs with instructions to report back forthwith with amendment SA 3316 made in Senate. (consideration: CR S7724; text: CR S7724)
Action By: Senate
12/11/2012S.Amdt.3315 Amendment SA 3315 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 3314. (consideration: CR S7724; text: CR S7724) Of a perfecting nature.
Action By: Senate
12/11/2012S.Amdt.3314 Amendment SA 3314 proposed by Senator Reid. (consideration: CR S7724; text: CR S7724) To change the enactment date.
Action By: Senate
12/11/2012Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S7724-7732)
Action By: Senate
12/11/2012Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7724)
Action By: Senate
12/11/2012Cloture on the motion to proceed to the bill invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 76 - 20. Record Vote Number: 225. (consideration: CR S7723-7724; text: CR S7723)
Action By: Senate
12/11/2012Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S7721-7723, S7723-7732, S7737-7742)
Action By: Senate
12/06/2012Cloture motion to the motion to proceed to the bill presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S7664; text: CR S7664)
Action By: Senate
12/06/2012Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S7664)
Action By: Senate
11/27/2012Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 554.
Action By: Senate
11/26/2012Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6896)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs12/13/2012 Committed to

No related bill information was received for S.3637.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3637. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/26/2012)

Amends the Federal Deposit Insurance Act and the Federal Credit Union Act to extend through December 31, 2014, the transaction account guarantee program (TAG) established by the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to provide unlimited deposit insurance for noninterest-bearing transaction accounts (NIBTAs).

Cites January 1, 2015, as the effective date upon which the net amount of insured deposit due to a depositor at an insured depository institution reverts to the standard statutory maximum ($250,000) for deposit insurance.

Requires the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC) and the National Credit Union Administration (NCUA), to fully offset, in each calendar year, any estimated losses that may occur to the Deposit Insurance Fund and to the National Credit Union Share Insurance Fund, respectively, as a result of this Act by: (1) estimating the losses, if any, that are expected to occur for each calendar year; and (2) collecting an amount equal to such estimated losses by September 30 of the calendar year, in addition to the assessments that would otherwise be collected by either the FDIC or the NCUA with respect to such year for insured depository institutions.