Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 02/16/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/17/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/08/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 04/12/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/13/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/05/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/23/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/08/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/15/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/15/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/20/2011