There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Animal Welfare Act to modify the definition of "exhibitor".


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
01/10/2013Became Public Law No: 112-261. (TXT | PDF)
01/10/2013Signed by President.
01/01/2013Presented to President.
12/31/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7495)
12/06/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7688; text as passed Senate: CR S7688)
12/06/2012Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/10/2013Became Public Law No: 112-261. (TXT | PDF)
01/10/2013Signed by President.
01/01/2013SenatePresented to President.
12/31/2012-11:51amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/31/2012-11:51amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7495)
12/31/2012-11:46amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3666.
12/31/2012-11:46amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7495)
12/31/2012-11:45amHouseMr. Griffin (AR) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/17/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
12/07/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
12/07/2012-11:03amHouseReceived in the House.
12/06/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/2012SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7688; text as passed Senate: CR S7688)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture12/07/2012 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry12/17/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.3666.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.3666. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-261 (01/10/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Animal Welfare Act to exclude from the definition of "exhibitor," for purposes of the licensing and other regulatory requirements of the Act, owners of common, domesticated household pets who derive less than a substantial portion of income from a nonprimary source for exhibiting an animal that exclusively resides at the residence of the pet owner.