Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/15/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/25/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/26/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/31/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 02/09/2012