Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/16/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/16/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/17/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/31/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/05/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/05/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/02/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/23/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/30/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/14/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 10/05/2011