There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 39, United States Code, to extend the authority of the United States Postal Service to issue a semipostal to raise funds for breast cancer research.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/23/2011Became Public Law No: 112-80. (TXT | PDF)
12/23/2011Signed by President.
12/16/2011Presented to President.
12/13/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 417 - 1 (Roll no. 921).(text: CR 12/12/2011 H8324)
12/05/2011Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8342; text as passed Senate: CR S8342)
11/29/2011Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. With written report No. 112-97.
02/17/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
12/23/2011Became Public Law No: 112-80. (TXT | PDF)
12/23/2011Signed by President.
12/16/2011SenatePresented to President.
12/13/2011-3:25pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 417 - 1 (Roll no. 921). (text: CR 12/12/2011 H8324)
12/13/2011-3:25pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/13/2011-3:18pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8760-8761)
12/12/2011-4:22pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Issa objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
12/12/2011-4:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 384.
12/12/2011-4:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8324-8325)
12/12/2011-4:16pmHouseMr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/06/2011-6:51pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/06/2011-5:58pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/06/2011SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/05/2011SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8342; text as passed Senate: CR S8342)
11/29/2011SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 239.
11/29/2011SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. With written report No. 112-97.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
10/19/2011SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
04/05/2011SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
02/17/2011SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S884)
02/17/2011SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S884)

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/10/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/14/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/02/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/02/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/02/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/02/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/02/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/02/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/02/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/02/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/02/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/02/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/03/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/05/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/12/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/12/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/19/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/08/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 06/09/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/16/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/13/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/13/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/13/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/14/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/18/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/18/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/25/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/25/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 08/02/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 08/02/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/06/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/06/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/06/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/15/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/20/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/31/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/17/2011

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/17/2011 Referred to
10/19/2011 Markup by
11/29/2011 Reported by S. Rept. 112-97
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security04/05/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.384. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-80 (12/23/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Extends, for four years, the authority of the U.S. Postal Service (USPS) to issue a semipostal to contribute to funding for breast cancer research.