Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/10/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/14/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/02/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/02/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/02/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/02/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/02/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/02/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/02/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/02/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/02/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/02/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/03/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/05/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/12/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/12/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/19/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/08/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/09/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/16/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/13/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/13/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/13/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/14/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/18/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/18/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/25/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/25/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 08/02/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 08/02/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/06/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/06/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/06/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/15/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/20/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/31/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/17/2011