Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/28/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/28/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 02/28/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/28/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/28/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/28/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/01/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/03/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/08/2011