Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/07/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/09/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/11/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/19/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew