Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/17/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/17/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/17/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/17/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/31/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/13/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/13/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/04/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/04/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/08/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/26/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/05/2011