Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/17/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/09/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/09/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/26/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/08/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/09/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/14/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/06/2012