Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/20/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/21/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/25/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/28/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/28/2011