Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/10/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/16/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/29/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/05/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/28/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/29/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/29/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/19/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/19/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/20/2011