Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/14/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/08/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/10/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/10/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/27/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/27/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/27/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/27/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/27/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 06/27/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/27/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/18/2011